This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/28/2022 at 14:14:08 (UTC).

Earnest N. Provo, Jr. vs. John Doe and All Other Occupants

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 Earnest N Provo, Jr filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against John Doe and All Other Occupants. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 6, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7139

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Provo, Earnest N., Jr.

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant

John Doe and All Other Occupants

Houston, TX 77026

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Deyon, Derek Hollis

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77002

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $130.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Provo, Earnest N., Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEviction-Writ of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: Provo, Earnest N., Jr.; Parties Against: John Doe and All Other Occupants; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketOrder-Final Judgment Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $129.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Provo, Earnest N., Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deyon, Derek H