Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/29/2018 at 14:06:52 (UTC).

Dover Pointe Apartments vs. Daniel Selexman, Doniese Crayon

Case Summary

On 03/14/2017 Dover Pointe Apartments filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Daniel Selexman, Doniese Crayon. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3276

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dover Pointe Apartments

2028 E Ben White Blvd Suite 240-1204

Austin, TX 78741

Defendants

Selexman, Daniel

Houston, TX 77049

Crayon, Doniese

Houston, TX 77049

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2017
  • Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Eviction-Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Order-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $130.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Dover Pointe Apartments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $191.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Dover Pointe Apartments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Hearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Judgment: Parties For: Dover Pointe Apartments; Parties Against: Selexman, Daniel and others; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $919.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dover Pointe Apartments is a litigant