This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/13/2018 at 12:40:34 (UTC).

Douglas Joe Scott vs. George Sandavor and All Occupants

Case Summary

On 06/13/2014 Douglas Joe Scott filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against George Sandavor and All Occupants. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 6, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0508

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCOTT, DOUGLAS JOE

Defendant

GEORGE SANDAVOR AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketEviction-Writ of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • DocketOrder-Final Judgment Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • DocketHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Scott, Douglas Joe; Parties Against: George Sandavor and All Occupants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • DocketDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less