Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/11/2021 at 23:34:22 (UTC).

Divine Assistance Services LLC dba Visiting Angels LAS vs. Glen T Payne

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 Divine Assistance Services LLC dba Visiting Angels LAS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Glen T Payne. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6665

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Divine Assistance Services LLC dba Visiting Angels LAS

16940 Highway 3

Webster, TX 77598

Defendant

Payne, Glen T

Friendswood, TX 77546

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Simmons, Richard A

15150 Middlebrook Drive

Houston, TX 77058

Defendant Attorney

Heston, James B

P.O. Box 6049

Katy, TX 77491

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: Divine Assistance Services LLC dba Visiting Angels LAS; Parties Against: Payne, Glen T; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $2297.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Agreed Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketOrder-Agreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAgreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • HearingDescription: Judge Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • HearingHearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Thu Dec 10 10:00:00 CST 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMotion for Continuance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketPending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketOrder Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketMotion for Discovery Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $124.00; Payment Type: Cashier's Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Divine Assistance Services LLC dba Visiting Angels LAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Simmons, Richard A