This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 05/28/2023 at 04:25:18 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs. Rodrigo Moreno

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rodrigo Moreno. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5762

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Moreno, Rodrigo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olsen-Zhang, Jessica

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketPending Setting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Discover Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less