This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/16/2019 at 03:01:30 (UTC).

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Bosco Credit VI Trust Series 2012-1 vs. Xochitl Castelo, Andres Castelo

Case Summary

On 07/20/2018 Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Bosco Credit VI Trust Series 2012-1 filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Xochitl Castelo, Andres Castelo. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8402

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Bosco Credit VI Trust Series 2012-1

Defendants

Castelo, Xochitl

Castelo, Andres

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Oliver, Leland Chance

5950 Berkshire Lane Suite 410

Dallas, TX 75225

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketOther Documents Not Listed - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketEviction-Writ of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketOrder-Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketNotice-Default Judgment 503.1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketPayment Information: Amount: $130.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Bosco Credit VI Trust Series 2012-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketPayment Information: Amount: $75.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Bosco Credit VI Trust Series 2012-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketPayment Information: Amount: $121.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Bosco Credit VI Trust Series 2012-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Tue Aug 14 13:00:00 CDT 2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Thu Aug 09 13:00:00 CDT 2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Bosco Credit VI Trust Series 2012-1; Parties Against: Castelo, Xochitl and others

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketDisposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less