This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/06/2019 at 11:50:07 (UTC).

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Bosco Credit VI Trust Serie vs. Rosa Canales

Case Summary

On 08/03/2018 Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Bosco Credit VI Trust Serie filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Rosa Canales. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5842

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Bosco Credit VI Trust Serie

Defendant

Canales, Rosa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Oliver, Leland Chance

Defendant Attorney

Valles, Robert, Jr

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketTranscript Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketStatement of Inability to Pay at Appeal Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketOrder-Final Judgment Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketEviction-Notice Filing Statement Inability Pay Apl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketPayment Information: Amount: $121.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Bosco Credit VI Trust Serie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Bosco Credit VI Trust Serie; Parties Against: Canales, Rosa

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less