This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/22/2022 at 22:57:05 (UTC).

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK vs. Mhdhamdi Alsadat

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mhdhamdi Alsadat. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5818

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

Alsadat, Mhdhamdi

Houston, TX 77057-2648

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moss, Michael A

P.O.Box 3340

Lubbock, TX 79452-3340

Defendant Attorney

Overstreet, James Nathan

8711 Highway 6 Northsuite 230

Houston, TX 77095

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Judge Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • HearingHearing: Judge Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • HearingHearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Other; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Wed Jan 12 09:00:00 CST 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketOrder-Granting Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketMotion for Continuance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A Moss