This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:11:30 (UTC).

Dawn Elizabeth Shepler vs. David Ginebra DBA Invum Three

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Dawn Elizabeth Shepler filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against David Ginebra DBA Invum Three. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8820

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shepler, Dawn Elizabeth

Houston, TX 77096

Defendant

David Ginebra DBA Invum Three

Houston, TX 77043

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $124.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Shepler, Dawn Elizabeth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less