This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/30/2023 at 15:51:17 (UTC).

Darrow Investment Group Inc vs. Audery Sherman

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Darrow Investment Group Inc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Audery Sherman. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 6, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9750

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darrow Investment Group Inc

9597 Jones Rd. #371

Houston, TX 77065

Defendant

Sherman, Audery

Houston, TX 77026

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Leticia, Leal

4104 Martin Luther King Blvd

Houston, TX 77204

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketEviction-Statement of Inability to Pay at Appeal Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketEviction-Notice Tenant Filing Statement of Inability Pay App

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketEviction-Notice Filing Statement Inability Pay Apl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketAppeal Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: Darrow Investment Group Inc; Parties Against: Sherman, Audery; Post-Judgment Interest: 7.0000%; Judgment Amount: $650.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketOrder-Final Judgment Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketLetter of Representation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $129.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Darrow Investment Group Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less