This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/11/2018 at 14:03:46 (UTC).

Cutberto Montejano vs. Abraham Solis

Case Summary

On 10/16/2014 Cutberto Montejano filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Abraham Solis. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 6, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1082

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Montejano, Cutberto

Defendant

Solis, Abraham

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2014
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • DocketEviction-Writ of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • DocketEviction-Notice of Default Judgment 510.6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • DocketHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Montejano, Cutberto; Parties Against: Solis, Abraham

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • DocketDisposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less