Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:04:55 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management, Llc Assignee Of Comenity Bank (metrostyle) vs. Ruby Felder

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Crown Asset Management, Llc Assignee Of Comenity Bank metrostyle filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ruby Felder. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2573

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management, Llc Assignee Of Comenity Bank (metrostyle)

Defendant

Felder, Ruby

Houston, TX 77016-4704

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lowery, Talisa K

15660 N. Dallas Parkway Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • HearingDescription: Default Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • HearingHearing: Default Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketOrder-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Crown Asset Management, Llc Assignee Of Comenity Bank (metrostyle)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less