Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:00:50 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (EXPRESS) vs. Leticia Alvarado

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Crown Asset Management LLC assignee of Comenity Bank EXPRESS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Leticia Alvarado. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2655

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (EXPRESS)

Defendant

Alvarado, Leticia

Houston, TX 77049

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lowery, Talisa K

15660 N. Dallas Parkway Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketResponse Due Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Crown Asset Management LLC assignee of Comenity Bank (EXPRESS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less