This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 09/25/2022 at 05:15:31 (UTC).

Credit Corp Solutions Inc vs. Sharetha Knight

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 Credit Corp Solutions Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sharetha Knight. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9591

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Credit Corp Solutions Inc

Defendant

Knight, Sharetha

Houston, TX 77022

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cooper, Matthew W

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011-5220

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Credit Corp Solutions Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Credit Corp Solutions Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper