This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/17/2023 at 02:10:50 (UTC).

Conn Appliances, Inc. vs. Kimberly Warner

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 Conn Appliances, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kimberly Warner. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9077

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conn Appliances, Inc.

Defendant

Warner, Kimberly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garza, Michael J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Conn Appliances, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less