This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/02/2021 at 03:04:36 (UTC).

Conn Appliances Inc vs. Jasmine Williams

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 Conn Appliances Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jasmine Williams. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8198

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conn Appliances Inc

Defendant

Williams, Jasmine

Houston, TX 77016

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anshul, Alex

Po. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011-5220

Other Attorneys

Stephens, Thomas W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Conn Appliances Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conn Appliances Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas W. Stephens