This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/29/2021 at 05:05:29 (UTC).

Conn Appliances, INC D/B/A Conn 's vs. Matthew Bennett

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Conn Appliances, INC D/B/A Conn 's filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Matthew Bennett. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9062

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conn Appliances, INC D/B/A Conn's

Defendant

Bennett, Matthew

Houston, TX 77015

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lowery, Talisa K

15660 N. Dallas Parkway Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Conn Appliances, INC D/B/A Conn's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conn Appliances Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TaLisa Karene Lowery