This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/10/2018 at 06:41:17 (UTC).

Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company vs. Gregory Longoria

Case Summary

On 07/31/2017 Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Gregory Longoria. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4870

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company

Defendant

Longoria, Gregory

Houston, TX 77084

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robinson, Jasmine F

105 Decker Court Suite 150

Irving, TX 75062

Robinson, Jasmine Francine

105 Decker Court Suite 150

Irving, TX 75062

Defendant Attorney

Bruce, Jonathan Evan

12810 Travita Drive

Houston, TX 77024

Other Attorneys

Bruce, Johnathan Evan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2017
  • Order-Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Motion to Dismiss Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Pending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $44.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Disposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less