This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/10/2018 at 12:10:07 (UTC).

Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company vs. Anibal Perea

Case Summary

On 08/03/2017 Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Anibal Perea. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1815

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company

105 Decker Court Suite 150

Irving, TX 75062

Defendant

Perea, Anibal

Houston, TX 77063

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robinson, Jasmine F

105 Decker Court Suite 150

Irving, TX 75062

Robinson, Jasmine Francine

105 Decker Court Suite 150

Irving, TX 75062

Defendant Attorney

Hart, Caitlin Louise

14950 Heathrow Forest Pkwy Suite 580

Houston, TX 77032

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2017
  • Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Motion for Discovery Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Motion for Discovery Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Motion for Discovery Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Motion Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Jury Fee Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $22.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Hart, Caitlin Louise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $44.00; Payment Type: Money Order; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Event: Motion Docket; Completion: Granted; Completion Date: Mon Dec 04 13:00:00 CST 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Event: Motion Docket; Completion: Other; Completion Date: Mon Oct 30 13:00:00 CDT 2017

    Read MoreRead Less