Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/01/2019 at 13:46:10 (UTC).

CMH La Maison LLC vs. Jonni Cole

Case Summary

On 01/10/2017 CMH La Maison LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Jonni Cole. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5064

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CMH La Maison LLC

1901 Lakeside Drive

Seabrook, TX 77586

Defendants

Cole, Jonni R

Seabrook, TX 77586

Cole, Jonni

Seabrook, TX 77586

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2017
  • Order-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Eviction-Request for Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Eviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $116.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: CMH La Maison LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Hearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Thu Jan 26 08:30:00 CST 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Judgment: Parties For: CMH La Maison LLC; Parties Against: Cole, Jonni; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $1290.37

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cmh La Maison Llc is a litigant