Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/31/2018 at 14:06:31 (UTC).

CMH La Maison LLC vs. Gary Rodrigues

Case Summary

On 02/10/2017 CMH La Maison LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Gary Rodrigues. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0654

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CMH La Maison LLC

1901 Lakeside Drive

Seabrook, TX 77586

Defendant

Rodrigues, Gary

Seabrook, TX 77586

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Eviction-Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Order-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Eviction-Request for Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Eviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $130.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: CMH La Maison LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $116.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: CMH La Maison LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Hearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Thu Feb 23 14:00:00 CST 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Judgment: Parties For: CMH La Maison LLC; Parties Against: Rodrigues, Gary; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $539.93

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cmh La Maison Llc is a litigant