This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/12/2018 at 14:32:12 (UTC).

Clark D Potter vs. Jack William Suza, Jr.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2014 Clark D Potter filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Jack William Suza, Jr. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 6, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1168

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POTTER, CLARK D

Defendant

Suza, Jack William, Jr.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2014
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • DocketEviction-Notice of Default Judgment 510.6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • DocketHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Potter, Clark D; Parties Against: Suza, Jack William, Jr.; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%; Judgment Amount: $2325.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • DocketDisposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less