This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 05/11/2023 at 04:01:34 (UTC).

City of Baytownvs.Joel Shane Jones

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 City of Baytownvs Joel Shane Jones was filed as a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 3, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3083

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

City of Baytown

GCCISD & Lee College District

Defendant

Jones, Joel Shane

Intervenor and Plaintiff

GCCISD & Lee College District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Strong, Randall B

Benoit, Brandon E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/10/2023

FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $129.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: City of Baytown

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023

DocketNotice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023

DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023

DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023

DocketMotion to Dismiss Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2023

FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $54.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: GCCISD & Lee College District

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2023

DocketNotice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023

DocketPetition in Intervention Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023

DocketService Return

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketSmall Claims-Tax Citation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCitation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2023

DocketOriginal Petition Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2023

DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

[+] Read More [-] Read Less