This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/24/2018 at 13:57:01 (UTC).

City of Baytownvs.Cinemacar Leasing Inc

Case Summary

On 01/08/2016 City of Baytownvs Cinemacar Leasing Inc was filed as a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8279

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF BAYTOWN

Defendant

CINEMACAR LEASING INC

Intervenors

Goose Creek Consolidated Independent School District and Lee College District

Doncarlos, Stephen H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRONG, RANDALL B

407 W Baker Rd Suite T

Baytown, TX 77521

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Writ of Execution-Money Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Order-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Notice-Default Judgment 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Hearing: Default Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Tue Nov 29 09:00:00 CST 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • Hearing: Default Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Tue Aug 09 09:00:00 CDT 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • Hearing: Default Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Tue May 31 13:24:16 CDT 2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Judgment: Parties For: City of Baytown and others; Parties Against: Cinemacar Leasing Inc; Post-Judgment Interest: 1.0000%; Judgment Amount: $1842.92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Strong, Randall B