This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 08/09/2022 at 14:20:23 (UTC).

City of Baytownvs.Bryan Jackson, Lesley Jackson

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 City of Baytownvs Bryan Jackson, Lesley Jackson was filed as a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8377

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Intervenors

City of Baytown

GCCISD & Lee College District

Defendants

Jackson, Bryan

Houston, TX 77044

Jackson, Lesley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Strong, Randall B

407 W. Baker Road, Suite Z

Baytown, TX 77521

Benoit, Brandon E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims-Tax Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketPetition in Intervention Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GCCISD & Lee College District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Strong, Randall B

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benoit, Brandon E