This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/17/2023 at 14:01:38 (UTC).

City of Baytownvs.Brandy Nicole Woods Ind & Dba Imagine Me Academy

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 City of Baytownvs Brandy Nicole Woods Ind Dba Imagine Me Academy was filed as a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 3, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3082

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Intervenors

City of Baytown

GCCISD & Lee College District

Defendant

Brandy Nicole Woods Ind & Dba Imagine Me Academy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Strong, Randall B

Benoit, Brandon E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/21/2023

DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $129.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: City of Baytown

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

DocketNotice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

DocketMotion to Dismiss Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023

DocketPetition in Intervention Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023

DocketService Return

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketSmall Claims-Tax Citation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCitation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2023

DocketOriginal Petition Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2023

DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

[+] Read More [-] Read Less