This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 07/18/2022 at 03:11:51 (UTC).

City of Baytownvs.Kevin Dwayne Garrett Ind & dba Eastside Adjustors

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 City of Baytownvs Kevin Dwayne Garrett Ind dba Eastside Adjustors was filed as a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9986

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Intervenors

City of Baytown

GCCISD & Lee College District

Defendant

Kevin Dwayne Garrett Ind & dba Eastside Adjustors

3 Crestbriar Ct

Baytown, TX 77521

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Strong, Randall B

407 W. Baker Road, Suite Z

Baytown, TX 77521

Benoit, Brandon E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims-Tax Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketOther Documents Not Listed - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketPetition in Intervention Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims-Tax Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GCCISD & Lee College District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Strong, Randall B

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benoit, Brandon E