This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/22/2023 at 14:47:09 (UTC).

Citibank, N.A. vs. Pamela Girdy

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Citibank, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Pamela Girdy. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6579

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citibank, N.A.

Defendant

Girdy, Pamela

Spring, TX 77373-8155

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ford, Joshua W

P.O. Box 65020

Lubbock, TX 79464

Defendant Attorney

Simmoneau, Haley

Po Box 1364

Mustang, OK 73064

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketPending Setting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketRequest for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketOrder-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Citibank, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less