This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:02:14 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. vs. Nathan Hanna

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Nathan Hanna. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8805

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 8, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

Hanna, Nathan

Deer Park, TX 77536-1546

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moss, Michael A

P.O. Box 3340

Lubbock, TX 79452

Defendant Attorney

Ayers, Christopher G

11 Broadway, Suite 960

New York, NY 10004

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • HearingDescription: Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • HearingHearing: Pretrial Conference; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Thu Mar 26 13:00:00 CDT 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketResponse Due Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: CITIBANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less