This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/07/2022 at 12:48:24 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. vs. Mark Salinas

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mark Salinas. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3898

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

Salinas, Mark

Houston, TX 77080-3523

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eren, Ozen

P.O.Box 3340

Lubbock, TX 79452-3340

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: CITIBANK, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eren, Ozen