Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:04:18 (UTC).

Citibank, N.A. vs. Jean A Woods

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Citibank, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jean A Woods. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4789

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citibank, N.A.

Defendant

Woods, Jean A

Houston, TX 77003-1342

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moss, Michael A

P.O. Box 3340

Lubbock, TX 79452

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Citibank, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less