This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/10/2022 at 04:25:27 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. vs. Jason Richey

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jason Richey. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 2, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4870

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

Richey, Jason

Friendswood, TX 77546-3420

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ford, Joshua W

Po Box 3340

Lubbock, TX 79464

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: CITIBANK, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua W Ford