This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:07:32 (UTC).

Citibank Na vs. Harold Cutting

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Citibank Na filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Harold Cutting. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8899

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citibank Na

Defendant

Cutting, Harold

Houston, TX 77082-4146

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moss, Michael A

P.O. Box 3340

Lubbock, TX 79452

Defendant Attorney

Brown, Shaun Gregory

P.O. Box 821437

Houston, TX 77282

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • HearingDescription: Judge Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • HearingHearing: Judge Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketRequest for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketOrder-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Citibank Na

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less