This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 05/01/2023 at 03:39:34 (UTC).

Cibolo Properties Assets, L.P. vs. Kevan Edwards + Occupants

Case Summary

On 11/02/2022 Cibolo Properties Assets, L P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Kevan Edwards Occupants. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 6, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1051

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cibolo Properties Assets, L.P.

Defendant

Kevan Edwards + Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yeverino, Francisco R, III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/16/2022

HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022

HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022

JudgementJudgment: Parties For: Cibolo Properties Assets, L.P.; Parties Against: Kevan Edwards + Occupants; Post-Judgment Interest: 6.2500%; Judgment Amount: $3173.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022

DispositionDisposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022

DocketOrder-Default Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022

DocketFinal Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022

DocketEviction-Notice of Default Judgment 510.6

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2022

DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022

DocketService Return

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2022

DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2022

DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2022

DocketConsent for Email Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022

FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $129.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Cibolo Properties Assets, L.P.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022

DocketOriginal Petition Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022

DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022

DocketEviction Citation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less