Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 05/30/2021 at 05:02:30 (UTC).

Chinedu Kinsella Ezeocha vs. United Parcel Service Inc

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Chinedu Kinsella Ezeocha filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against United Parcel Service Inc. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5073

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ezeocha, Chinedu Kinsella

Defendant

United Parcel Service Inc

55 Glenlake Pkwy Ne

Atlanta, GA 30328

Not Classified By Court

CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY d/b/a CSC-LAWYERS INCORPORATING SERVICE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Cammack, Thomas N, III

8000 Ih 10 West Suite 1600

San Antonio, TX 78230

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketPending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Ezeocha, Chinedu Kinsella

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Parcel Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas N. Cammack, III