Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/18/2018 at 13:48:55 (UTC).

Cerastes Llc Successor in Interest of Pharia Llcvs.Aristeed Jamerson

Case Summary

On 07/16/2015 Cerastes Llc Successor in Interest of Pharia Llcvs Aristeed Jamerson was filed as an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7451

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CERASTES LLC SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OF PHARIA LLC

Defendant

JAMERSON, ARISTEED A

Houston, TX 77047

Garnishee

Wells Fargo Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GERBER, YONATAN Z

5555 West Loop South Suite 200

Bellaire, TX 77401

Gerber, Yonatan Zeev

5555 W Loop South Suite 400

Bellaire, TX 77401

Other Attorneys

Pearson, James Haralson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2016
  • Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Agreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • Agreed Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Hearing: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Judgment: Parties For: Cerastes Llc Successor in Interest of Pharia Llc; Parties Against: Jamerson, Aristeed A and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Disposition: Agreed Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cerastes LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEARSON, JAMES HARALSON