This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/27/2023 at 05:19:14 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I, LLC Assignee of Synchrony Bank vs. Sergio Hinojo

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Cavalry SPV I, LLC Assignee of Synchrony Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sergio Hinojo. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6575

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I, LLC Assignee of Synchrony Bank

Defendant

Hinojo, Sergio

Humble, TX 77346-5004

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Young, Dan G

P.O. Box 420

Lubbock, TX 79408-0420

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketPending Judge Trial Setting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Cavalry SPV I, LLC Assignee of Synchrony Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less