This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:03:56 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I, LLC, Assignee of Citibank, N.A. vs. Hyun J Lee

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Cavalry SPV I, LLC, Assignee of Citibank, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Hyun J Lee. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8752

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I, LLC, Assignee of Citibank, N.A.

500 Summit Lake Drive Suite 400

Valhalla, NY 10595

Defendant

Lee, Hyun J

Houston, TX 77035-5312

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, Assignee of Citibank, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less