This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:12:37 (UTC).

Cavalry Spv I, LLC, as Assignee of Citibank, N.A./AAdvantage vs. Christopher Mcfall

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Cavalry Spv I, LLC, as Assignee of Citibank, N A /AAdvantage filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Christopher Mcfall. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8862

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry Spv I, LLC, as Assignee of Citibank, N.A./AAdvantage

Defendant

Mcfall, Christopher

Houston, TX 77004-1315

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robbins, Mitchell B

275 W. Campbell, Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Cavalry Spv I, LLC, as Assignee of Citibank, N.A./AAdvantage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less