This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 08/07/2023 at 03:30:41 (UTC).

Villas at Eastwood vs. Donald Nelson

Case Summary

On 02/08/2023 Villas at Eastwood filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Donald Nelson. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 6, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3420

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Villas at Eastwood

Defendant

Nelson, Donald

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fulton, Kevin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketWrit Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $130.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Villas at Eastwood

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketEviction-Writ of Possession-Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: Villas at Eastwood; Parties Against: Nelson, Donald; Post-Judgment Interest: 7.5000%; Judgment Amount: $788.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DispositionDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketOrder-Final Judgment Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketEviction-Request for Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketConsent for Email Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $108.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Villas at Eastwood

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less