This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 07/09/2023 at 04:04:20 (UTC).

Los Prados vs. Saida Camacho

Case Summary

On 04/10/2023 Los Prados filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Saida Camacho. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7747

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Los Prados

Defendant

Camacho, Saida

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fulton, Kevin

Other Attorneys

Roberts, Mark E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: Los Prados; Parties Against: Camacho, Saida; Post-Judgment Interest: 7.7500%; Judgment Amount: $1605.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DispositionDisposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketOrder-Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketEviction-Notice of Default Judgment 510.6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketEviction-Request for Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $108.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Los Prados

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketConsent for Email Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less