This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 09/19/2023 at 03:07:26 (UTC).

GCCISD & Lee College Districtvs.TRUNG NGUYEN INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA NAILS 7 & SPA

Case Summary

On 03/23/2023 GCCISD Lee College Districtvs TRUNG NGUYEN INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA NAILS 7 SPA was filed as a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 3, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5919

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Intervenors

GCCISD & Lee College District

City of Baytown

Defendant

TRUNG NGUYEN INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA NAILS 7 & SPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benoit, Brandon E

Strong, Randall B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/12/2023

JudgementJudgment: Parties For: GCCISD & Lee College District and others; Parties Against: TRUNG NGUYEN INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA NAILS 7 & SPA; Post-Judgment Interest: 1.0000%; Judgment Amount: $2701.95

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023

DispositionDisposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023

DocketOrder-Default Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023

DocketNotice-Default Judgment 503.1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023

DocketDefault Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023

DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketPetition in Intervention Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023

DocketService Return

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023

DocketSmall Claims-Tax Citation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023

DocketCitation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023

DocketOriginal Petition Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023

DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

[+] Read More [-] Read Less