This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 11/23/2023 at 04:17:32 (UTC).

City of Baytownvs.Michael Coffey Ind & dba Sacred Leaf Zero

Case Summary

On 08/15/2023 City of Baytownvs Michael Coffey Ind dba Sacred Leaf Zero was filed as a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 3, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0448

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Intervenors

City of Baytown

GCCISD & Lee College District

Defendant

Michael Coffey Ind & dba Sacred Leaf Zero

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Strong, Randall B

Benoit, Brandon E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/07/2023

DocketCounter/Cross/Interpleader/Intervention/Third Party-eFile

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketService Return

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketAnswer Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketSmall Claims-Tax Citation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketCitation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketOriginal Petition Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

[+] Read More [-] Read Less