This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 09/06/2023 at 04:09:38 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. vs. Elda J Sanchez A/K/A Elda Sanchez

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Elda J Sanchez A/K/A Elda Sanchez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 7, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4756

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant

Sanchez A/K/A Elda Sanchez, Elda J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allen, Katharine

Other Attorneys

Goenaga, Juan Carlos

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: Judge Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2023
  • HearingHearing: Judge Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less