This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 09/21/2023 at 04:10:45 (UTC).

Mario Guzman vs. Anna Marie Lasoya

Case Summary

On 04/24/2023 Mario Guzman filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Anna Marie Lasoya. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 6, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7971

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Guzman, Mario

Defendant

Lasoya, Anna Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garcia, Ernie

Defendant Attorney

Leal, Leticia

Other Attorneys

Amagwula, Richard

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketTranscript Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketTranscript of Judgment from Justice Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketEviction-Statement of Inability to Pay at Appeal Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketEviction-Notice Tenant Filing Statement of Inability Pay App

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketEviction-Notice Filing Statement Inability Pay Apl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketAppeal Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: Guzman, Mario; Parties Against: Lasoya, Anna Marie; Post-Judgment Interest: 8.0000%; Judgment Amount: $1450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketOrder-Final Judgment Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketLetter of Representation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $108.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Guzman, Mario

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less