This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/06/2023 at 04:12:13 (UTC).

Velocity Investments, Llc vs. Joshua Bowman

Case Summary

On 09/07/2023 Velocity Investments, Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Joshua Bowman. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 4, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1572

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Velocity Investments, Llc

Defendant

Bowman, Joshua

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Baxter, Kyla Nicole

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/29/2023

DocketPending Judge Trial Setting

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketAnswer Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketAffidavit Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Velocity Investments, Llc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketDebt Claim-Citation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketCitation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketOriginal Petition Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketExhibit Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

[+] Read More [-] Read Less