Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/31/2018 at 13:14:42 (UTC).

Cascade at Fall Creek vs. Yolanda Owens

Case Summary

On 04/12/2017 Cascade at Fall Creek filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Yolanda Owens. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3425

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cascade at Fall Creek

8440 N Sam Houston Pkwy E

Humble, TX 77396

Defendant

Owens, Yolanda

Humble, TX 77396

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2017
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Transcript Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Eviction-Statement of Inability to Pay at Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Eviction-Notice Tenant Filing Statement of Inability Pay App

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Eviction-Notice Filing Statement Inability Pay Apl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $116.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Cascade at Fall Creek

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Hearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Judgment: Parties For: Cascade at Fall Creek; Parties Against: Owens, Yolanda; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $1468.39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less