This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/16/2023 at 05:08:51 (UTC).

Casa Cruz Apartments vs. Dalia Ibarra

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Casa Cruz Apartments filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Dalia Ibarra. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 2, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9296

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Casa Cruz Apartments

6727 Telephone Rd.#241

Houston, TX 77061

Defendant

Ibarra, Dalia

Houston, TX 77061

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: Casa Cruz Apartments; Parties Against: Ibarra, Dalia; Post-Judgment Interest: 7.0000%; Judgment Amount: $1516.60

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketOrder-Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketEviction-Request for Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $129.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Casa Cruz Apartments

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Casa Cruz Apartments is a litigant