This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/18/2019 at 03:22:51 (UTC).

Carrington Mortgage Services LLC vs. Ronnie Allen Aaron, Darlent R Aaron

Case Summary

On 08/22/2018 Carrington Mortgage Services LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Ronnie Allen Aaron, Darlent R Aaron. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 8, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2825

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carrington Mortgage Services LLC

Defendants

Aaron, Ronnie Allen

Aaron, Darlent R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Oliver, Leland Chance

5950 Berkshire Lane Suite 410

Dallas, TX 75225

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketRelease of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketOrder-Agreed Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketAgreed Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketPayment Information: Amount: $196.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Carrington Mortgage Services LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Wed Sep 05 10:00:00 CDT 2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Carrington Mortgage Services LLC; Parties Against: Aaron, Ronnie Allen and others

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketDisposition: Agreed Judgment (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less