This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/20/2019 at 03:03:50 (UTC).

Carrington Mortgage Services LLC vs. Michael Smith, Britney Robinson

Case Summary

On 09/21/2018 Carrington Mortgage Services LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Michael Smith, Britney Robinson. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 3, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0854

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carrington Mortgage Services LLC

Defendants

Robinson, Britney

Smith, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Oliver, Leland Chance

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketEviction-Writ of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketOrder-Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketEviction-Notice of Default Judgment 510.6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketPayment Information: Amount: $155.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Carrington Mortgage Services LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketPayment Information: Amount: $196.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Carrington Mortgage Services LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Carrington Mortgage Services LLC; Parties Against: Smith, Michael and others

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketDisposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less